WA SB6257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing early intervention services for eligible children.
Title
Providing early intervention services for eligible children.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 261, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-16 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2650 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-24 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.