WA SB6256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing firms in the Canadian province of British Columbia to perform attest or compilation services for companies in Washington state that are the consolidated, subsidiary, or component entity of another corporate entity registered in Canada.
Title
Allowing firms in the Canadian province of British Columbia to perform attest or compilation services for companies in Washington state that are the consolidated, subsidiary, or component entity of another corporate entity registered in Canada.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2468 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6256&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6256.pdf |