WA SB6252 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the parks and recreation commission to approve leases.
Title
Concerning the authority of the parks and recreation commission to approve leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2601 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6252&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6252.pdf |