WA SB6246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for approval of school district bonds by fifty-five percent of the voters voting.
Title
Providing for approval of school district bonds by fifty-five percent of the voters voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |