WA SB6245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting refugees and immigrants.
Title
Assisting refugees and immigrants.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | New Code | See Bill Text |