WA SB6245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning visual screening in schools.
Title
Concerning visual screening in schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 219, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-25 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |