WA SB6242 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating hazardous waste fee provisions.
Title
Updating hazardous waste fee provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2459 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.