WA SB6237 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing license issuance fees imposed on spirits retail licensees.
Title
Addressing license issuance fees imposed on spirits retail licensees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-02-24 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-24 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; without recommendation. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2435 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-17 - First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight