WA SB6236 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain noneconomic damage waivers.
Title
Concerning certain noneconomic damage waivers.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 254, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |