WA SB6236 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington state economic growth commission.
Title
Establishing the Washington state economic growth commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | TED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | EDIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. |