WA SB6228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring voter eligibility for all persons convicted of a felony offense who are not in total confinement under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections.
Title
Restoring voter eligibility for all persons convicted of a felony offense who are not in total confinement under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2292 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.