WA SB6226 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales by craft and general licensed distilleries of spirits for off-premise consumption and spirits samples for on-premise consumption.
Title
Concerning sales by craft and general licensed distilleries of spirits for off-premise consumption and spirits samples for on-premise consumption.
Sponsors
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 92, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-24 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2364 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.