WA SB6223 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning equitable educational outcomes for foster children and youth from preschool to postsecondary education.
Title
Concerning equitable educational outcomes for foster children and youth from preschool to postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-19 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2877 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-19 - First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services