WA SB6222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expansion of extended foster care eligibility.
Title
Concerning expansion of extended foster care eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chapter 34, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.