WA SB6221 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington achieving a better life experience program account.
Title
Concerning the Washington achieving a better life experience program account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 76, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-20 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2581 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.