WA SB6220 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning determination of the terms and conditions of bonds, notes, and other evidences of indebtedness of the state of Washington.
Title
Concerning determination of the terms and conditions of bonds, notes, and other evidences of indebtedness of the state of Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-04-13 | Chapter 18, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-04-13 | Governor signed. | |
2010-04-08 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-07 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-07 | President signed. | |
2010-04-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2010-04-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-02 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. | |
2010-01-29 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2010-01-29 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2452 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-02 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.