WA SB6218 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bringing the state into compliance with the federal FAST act.
Title
Bringing the state into compliance with the federal FAST act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 105, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2606 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.