WA SB6216 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disclosure of existing property tax levies on ballot propositions subject to voter approval for levy lid lifts.
Title
Concerning the disclosure of existing property tax levies on ballot propositions subject to voter approval for levy lid lifts.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] |
Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-19 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2578 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6216&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6216.pdf |