WA SB6214 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing industrial insurance coverage for posttraumatic stress disorders of law enforcement and firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing industrial insurance coverage for posttraumatic stress disorders of law enforcement and firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-23SenateChapter 264, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-23SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-20HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards
2018-02-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-24SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback