WA SB6208 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public hospital district health and wellness promotion activities and superintendent appointment and removal.
Title
Concerning public hospital district health and wellness promotion activities and superintendent appointment and removal.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2539 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6208&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6208.pdf |