WA SB6208 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving the integrity of veterans' benefit-related services.
Title
Preserving the integrity of veterans' benefit-related services.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 67, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-20 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-20 | House | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2390 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.