WA SB6203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing carbon pollution by moving to a clean energy economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing carbon pollution by moving to a clean energy economy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateEENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 6:00 PM.
2018-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback