WA SB6195 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Title
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |