WA SB6192 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for modification of the disposition concerning restitution in juvenile cases.
Title
Providing for modification of the disposition concerning restitution in juvenile cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 134, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |