WA SB6190 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the use of a signature stamp for voting purposes.
Title
Allowing the use of a signature stamp for voting purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |