WA SB6189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changing driving a motor vehicle with a suspended or revoked driver's license provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing driving a motor vehicle with a suspended or revoked driver's license provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReturned to Rules.
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Transportation.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-21SenateTRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-01SenateOn motion, referred to Transportation.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB2481 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback