WA SB6181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a donation program for resident disabled veterans to receive hunting and fishing licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a donation program for resident disabled veterans to receive hunting and fishing licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-02-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-25SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB2342 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback