WA SB6181 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child care subsidies and child support enforcement services.
Title
Concerning child care subsidies and child support enforcement services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |