WA SB6175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Washington uniform common interest ownership act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the Washington uniform common interest ownership act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 7/1/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 277, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-22HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-10Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateFI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM.
2018-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback