WA SB6160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising conditions under which a person is subject to exclusive adult jurisdiction and extending juvenile court jurisdiction over serious cases to age twenty-five.
Title
Revising conditions under which a person is subject to exclusive adult jurisdiction and extending juvenile court jurisdiction over serious cases to age twenty-five.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 162, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |