WA SB6157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding prior authorization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding prior authorization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-22SenateChapter 193, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-23HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB2837 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback