WA SB6157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Title
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2313 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6157&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6157.pdf |