WA SB6155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rape of a child.
Title
Concerning the rape of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |