WA SB6152 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the operation of the Interstate 405 express toll lanes.
Title
Modifying the operation of the Interstate 405 express toll lanes.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.