WA SB6142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Washington common application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Washington common application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-11SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2020-02-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-04SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-04SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2514 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback