WA SB6142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the authority of commissioners of courts of limited jurisdiction.
Title
Revising the authority of commissioners of courts of limited jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |