WA SB6140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the practice of transcript withholding and limiting the practice of registration holds at institutions of higher education as debt collection practices.
Title
Prohibiting the practice of transcript withholding and limiting the practice of registration holds at institutions of higher education as debt collection practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2513 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6140&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6140.pdf |