WA SB6137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the relationship between manufacturers and new motor vehicle dealers by providing tools to resolve disparities including expanding compensation for recalled vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the relationship between manufacturers and new motor vehicle dealers by providing tools to resolve disparities including expanding compensation for recalled vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 296, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-21HouseBFS - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-21HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services
2018-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB2439 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback