WA SB6135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Updating application requirements for the academic acceleration incentive program.
Title
Updating application requirements for the academic acceleration incentive program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2495 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-10 - First reading, referred to Education