WA SB6131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the debenture company laws from the securities act of Washington.
Title
Repealing the debenture company laws from the securities act of Washington.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 151, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-20 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2407 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.