WA SB6129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an ambulance transport quality assurance fee.
Title
Concerning an ambulance transport quality assurance fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2708 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-12 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness