WA SB6128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extending coverage during the postpartum period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending coverage during the postpartum period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-17Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on second reading.
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-27SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM.
2020-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-01-02SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2381 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6128&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6128.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6128-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6128-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6128-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6128-S2.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120815&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6128&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120815&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6128&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120815&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6128&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback