WA SB6124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that court hearings under the involuntary commitment act may be conducted by video.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying that court hearings under the involuntary commitment act may be conducted by video.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-28SenateChapter 305, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-28SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM.
2018-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-14Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-24SenateHSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback