WA SB6117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising conditions under which juvenile court records may be sealed.
Title
Revising conditions under which juvenile court records may be sealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |