WA SB6114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the issuance of identicards to individuals released from certain juvenile rehabilitation facilities.
Title
Concerning the issuance of identicards to individuals released from certain juvenile rehabilitation facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2372 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6114&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6114.pdf |