WA SB6110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing the child fatality statute.
Title
Modernizing the child fatality statute.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |