WA SB6110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting employers from asking about arrests or convictions before an applicant is determined otherwise qualified for a position.
Title
Prohibiting employers from asking about arrests or convictions before an applicant is determined otherwise qualified for a position.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |