WA SB6110 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating retainage bonds on public contracts.
Title
Regulating retainage bonds on public contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-25 | House | CB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |