WA SB6096 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chapter 34, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chapter 34, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cancer research.
Title
Concerning cancer research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 34, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-29 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |