WA SB6094 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of jail data for research purposes in the public interest.
Title
Authorizing the use of jail data for research purposes in the public interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |